NY A07808 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - print number 7808a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - print number 7808a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the feathered lives also count act directing the commissioner of general services to incorporate practices and strategies to reduce bird fatality resulting from collisions with certain state-owned or state-leased buildings, and for other purposes; requires the commissioner to develop a design guide that includes features, methods and strategies, and best practices for reducing bird fatalities; requires the commissioner to report to the governor and the legislature.
Title
Enacts the feathered lives also count act directing the commissioner of general services to incorporate practices and strategies to reduce bird fatality resulting from collisions with certain state-owned or state-leased buildings, and for other purposes; requires the commissioner to develop a design guide that includes features, methods and strategies, and best practices for reducing bird fatalities; requires the commissioner to report to the governor and the legislature.
Sponsors
Asm. Anna Kelles [D] | Asm. Dana Levenberg [D] | Asm. Juan Ardila [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Assembly | print number 7808a |
2024-02-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07098 (Same As) 2024-02-26 - PRINT NUMBER 7098A