NY A07819 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - signed chap.405
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to state contracts for landscape architecture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to state contracts for landscape architecture.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21Senatesigned chap.405
2018-12-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-14SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-14Senate3RD READING CAL.1781
2018-06-14SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1330A
2018-05-31SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2018-05-31Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-05-31Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-24Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.952
2018-05-22Assemblyreported
2018-05-08Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-05-01Assemblyprint number 7819a
2018-05-01Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental operations
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2017-05-16Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S01330 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7819A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07819&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07819&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07819
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07819&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07819A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07819&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07819&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07819&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A7819#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback