NY A07849 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-17 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-17 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires access aisles of handicapped accessible parking spaces to be at least eight feet wide.
Title
Requires access aisles of handicapped accessible parking spaces to be at least eight feet wide.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-17 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | |
2010-05-17 | delivered to senate | |
2010-05-17 | passed assembly | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.527 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-05-11 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | |
2009-05-11 | delivered to senate | |
2009-05-11 | passed assembly | |
2009-05-07 | advanced to third reading cal.544 | |
2009-05-05 | reported | |
2009-05-05 | reported referred to codes | |
2009-04-27 | referred to transportation |