NY A07850 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a half fare rate program in the MTA for veterans.
Title
Relates to a half fare rate program in the MTA for veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | print number 7850a |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S05545 (Same As) 2016-03-23 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions