NY A07870 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of environmental conservation to adopt rules and regulations requiring permittees to place air monitoring equipment at an appropriate distance from permitted waste transfer stations to measure data for ozone, sulfur dioxide, oxides of nitrogen, carbon dioxide, meteorological data, PM 1.0 and PM 2.5.
Title
Directs the department of environmental conservation to adopt rules and regulations requiring permittees to place air monitoring equipment at an appropriate distance from permitted waste transfer stations to measure data for ozone, sulfur dioxide, oxides of nitrogen, carbon dioxide, meteorological data, PM 1.0 and PM 2.5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.277 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.277 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | print number 7870a |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S09114 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES