NY A07875 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Hempstead, in the county of Nassau, to establish a speed limit of less than 30 miles per hour on certain highways in the community of East Atlantic Beach.
Title
Authorizes the town of Hempstead, in the county of Nassau, to establish a speed limit of less than 30 miles per hour on certain highways in the community of East Atlantic Beach.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06839 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - referred to transportation