NY A07886 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - substituted by s5441b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - substituted by s5441b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Dedicates a bridge in the town of Tonawanda as the NYS Trooper Kevin P. Dobson, Sr. Memorial Bridge.
Title
Dedicates a bridge in the town of Tonawanda as the NYS Trooper Kevin P. Dobson, Sr. Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Asm. Robin Schimminger [D] | Asm. Dennis Gabryszak [D] | Asm. Stephen Hawley [R] | Asm. Jane Corwin [R] |
Asm. Raymond Walter [R] | Asm. Joseph Giglio [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | Assembly | substituted by s5441b |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.654 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.654 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | print number 7886b |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | print number 7886a |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2013-06-07 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05441 (Same As) 2013-09-27 - SIGNED CHAP.375