NY A07915 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.561
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.561
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the personal information of a credit or debit card holder; adds zip code, e-mail address and home, cell and work telephone numbers to the personal information protected.
Title
Relates to the personal information of a credit or debit card holder; adds zip code, e-mail address and home, cell and work telephone numbers to the personal information protected.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.561 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.350 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.350 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S08388 (Same As) 2018-05-04 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION