NY A07962 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.272
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.272
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enables the commissioner of social services to review state plans which provide for special transportation services for children and pre-school children to ensure that state policies are not more restrictive than policies at the federal level.
Title
Enables the commissioner of social services to review state plans which provide for special transportation services for children and pre-school children to ensure that state policies are not more restrictive than policies at the federal level.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.272 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.296 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a7962a |
2019-06-13 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | AMENDED 4770A |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.836 |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s4770a |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.296 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.296 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | print number 7962a |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04770 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.272