NY A07968 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Greene county to enter into an agreement with a contiguous county to share the construction, financing, improvement, maintenance and/or housing of persons in the custody of the sheriff of a county jail.
Title
Authorizes Greene county to enter into an agreement with a contiguous county to share the construction, financing, improvement, maintenance and/or housing of persons in the custody of the sheriff of a county jail.
Sponsors
Asm. Joseph Lentol [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Michael Blake [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] |
Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | print number 7968a |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to correction |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S06267 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT