NY A08036 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-12 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-12 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for mandatory continuing education for psychologists.
Title
Provides for mandatory continuing education for psychologists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S05918 (Same As) 2018-01-16 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN