NY A08083 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - substituted by s6265a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Ensures that utility employees, who currently fall outside the definition of an employee that may receive the prevailing wage, fall under such wage requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensures that utility employees, who currently fall outside the definition of an employee that may receive the prevailing wage, fall under such wage requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s6265a
2019-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.610
2019-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.610
2019-06-19Assemblyreported
2019-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-17Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-06-14Assemblyprint number 8083a
2019-06-14Assemblyamend and recommit to labor
2019-05-31Assemblyreferred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S06265 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08083&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08083&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08083
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08083&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08083A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08083&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08083&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08083&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback