NY A08084 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.85
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.85
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions providing enhanced consumer and provider protections under contracts with managed care organizations.
Title
Extends certain provisions providing enhanced consumer and provider protections under contracts with managed care organizations.
Sponsors
Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] | Asm. Jamie Romeo [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] |
Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.85 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.420 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a8084 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | referred to health |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1370 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s6318 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.420 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.420 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06318 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.85