NY A08106 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to thoroughbred equine drug testing standards.
Title
Relates to thoroughbred equine drug testing standards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2019-12-18 | Assembly | print number 8106a |
2019-12-18 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to racing and wagering |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S06142 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - referred to racing and wagering