NY A08123 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-15)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - print number 8123b
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - print number 8123b
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits public schools from denying admission to unvaccinated students if their parents submit a form stating that such vaccinations are contrary to their genuine and sincere religious beliefs.
Title
Prohibits public schools from denying admission to unvaccinated students if their parents submit a form stating that such vaccinations are contrary to their genuine and sincere religious beliefs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Assembly | print number 8123b |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | print number 8123a |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S06141 (Same As) 2018-05-31 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE