NY A08127 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - signed chap.99
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - signed chap.99
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the use of electronic means for the commencement and filing of papers in certain actions and proceedings.
Title
Relates to the use of electronic means for the commencement and filing of papers in certain actions and proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-24 | Senate | signed chap.99 |
2017-07-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1137 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6408A |
2017-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.188 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.188 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06408 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8127