NY A08139 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the Viola Methodist Church to file an application for a real property tax exemption for the 2014 assessment roll.
Title
Permits the Viola Methodist Church to file an application for a real property tax exemption for the 2014 assessment roll.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-03-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.584 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.657 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.657 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S06811 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES