NY A08150 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - substituted by s6358
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the time period for the conveyance of lands for the establishment of the Gateway National Recreation Area until June 30, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the time period for the conveyance of lands for the establishment of the Gateway National Recreation Area until June 30, 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s6358
2019-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.696
2019-06-20Assemblyreported
2019-06-17Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-12Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-06-04Assemblyreferred to cities

Same As/Similar To

S06358 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.88

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback