NY A08160 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - substituted by s2154a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - substituted by s2154a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to creating a hotline for the reporting of various forms of abuse which may jeopardize the health or welfare of any person.
Title
Relates to creating a hotline for the reporting of various forms of abuse which may jeopardize the health or welfare of any person.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Assembly | substituted by s2154a |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.356 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S02154 (Same As) 2017-11-29 - VETOED MEMO.184