NY A08177 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.231
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to justices presiding in an off-hours arraignment part.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to justices presiding in an off-hours arraignment part.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24Senatesigned chap.231
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-03-27SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-03-27SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-03-27Senate3RD READING CAL.596
2018-03-27SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6538
2018-03-27SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2018-03-27Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-03-27Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.592
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-06-13SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-13Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-13Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-12Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.193
2017-06-12Assemblyrules report cal.193
2017-06-12Assemblyreported
2017-06-07Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-06-01Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S06538 (Same As) 2018-03-27 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8177

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08177&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08177&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08177
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08177&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08177&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08177&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A8177#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback