NY A08185 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.249
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.249
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the board of managers of a condominium to allow unit owner meetings to be conducted via electronic means.
Title
Authorizes the board of managers of a condominium to allow unit owner meetings to be conducted via electronic means.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Assembly | signed chap.249 |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-05 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.451 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7278B |
2022-04-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.512 |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | reported |
2022-03-15 | Assembly | print number 8185b |
2022-03-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to housing |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | print number 8185a |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to housing |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2021-08-25 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S07278 (Same As) 2022-05-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8185B