NY A08222 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-25 - print number 8222a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-25 - print number 8222a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the class A-I felony of criminal use of a firearm for possessing a deadly weapon or displaying what appears to be or is a rifle, pistol, revolver, shotgun, machine gun or other firearm during the commission of a class A or violent felony; repeals the offenses of criminal use of a firearm in the first and second degrees.
Title
Establishes the class A-I felony of criminal use of a firearm for possessing a deadly weapon or displaying what appears to be or is a rifle, pistol, revolver, shotgun, machine gun or other firearm during the commission of a class A or violent felony; repeals the offenses of criminal use of a firearm in the first and second degrees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-25 | Assembly | print number 8222a |
2012-01-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-06-07 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S05518 (Same As) 2012-01-23 - PRINT NUMBER 5518A