NY A08262 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.432
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.432
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the comptroller of the town of Mount Pleasant to refund fees, fines, penalties and interest to certain real property taxpayers.
Title
Authorizes the comptroller of the town of Mount Pleasant to refund fees, fines, penalties and interest to certain real property taxpayers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.432 |
2019-10-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.665 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a8262a |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1523 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6257A |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6257a |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.665 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-15 | Assembly | print number 8262a |
2019-06-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06257 (Same As) 2019-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.432