NY A08317 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-29 - amended on third reading (t) 8317a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-29 - amended on third reading (t) 8317a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to appellate review of an ex parte order or applications for provisional remedies.
Title
Relates to appellate review of an ex parte order or applications for provisional remedies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | amended on third reading (t) 8317a | |
2010-06-29 | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading | |
2010-06-29 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-29 | recalled from senate | |
2010-04-26 | REFERRED TO CODES | |
2010-04-26 | delivered to senate | |
2010-04-26 | passed assembly | |
2010-04-22 | advanced to third reading cal.801 | |
2010-04-19 | reported | |
2010-01-19 | committed to codes | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.574 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-06-02 | REFERRED TO CODES | |
2009-06-02 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-02 | passed assembly | |
2009-05-28 | advanced to third reading cal.704 | |
2009-05-27 | reported | |
2009-05-14 | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S5964 (Same As) 2010-05-17 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING