NY A08375 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - substituted by s6683a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - substituted by s6683a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the certification of a deputy sheriff as a police officer by the police department of the city of New York.
Title
Relates to the certification of a deputy sheriff as a police officer by the police department of the city of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Assembly | substituted by s6683a |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.162 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.162 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | print number 8375a |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06683 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.477