NY A08403 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-22 - print number 8403a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-22 - print number 8403a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the 2012 facility alternatives for schools act, which authorizes construction of new school facilities at a lower cost and in a faster time frame than is permitted under current law by using current development, construction, reconstruction, leasing and financing techniques available.
Title
Enacts the 2012 facility alternatives for schools act, which authorizes construction of new school facilities at a lower cost and in a faster time frame than is permitted under current law by using current development, construction, reconstruction, leasing and financing techniques available.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | Assembly | print number 8403a |
2012-02-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to education |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S03190 (Same As) 2012-03-12 - PRINT NUMBER 3190B