NY A08425 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-20 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-20 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to injunctive relief incidental to employer and employee organization improper practices; board's judgment may be rendered ineffectual without provisional relief.
Title
Relates to injunctive relief incidental to employer and employee organization improper practices; board's judgment may be rendered ineffectual without provisional relief.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | reported referred to codes | |
2010-01-06 | referred to governmental employees | |
2009-06-10 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-06-02 | reported referred to codes | |
2009-05-20 | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S5542 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS