NY A08448 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s6757a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s6757a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the North Bellmore Fire District to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Title
Authorizes the North Bellmore Fire District to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s6757a |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.317 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-02-09 | Assembly | print number 8448a |
2018-02-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2017-06-16 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S06757 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.479