NY A08457 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-17 - print number 8457a
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-17 - print number 8457a
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the maximum value of a small estate from $30,000 to $100,000.
Title
Increases the maximum value of a small estate from $30,000 to $100,000.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-17 | print number 8457a | |
2010-05-17 | amend and recommit to judiciary | |
2010-01-06 | referred to judiciary | |
2009-05-21 | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S4421 (Same As) 2010-05-25 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING