NY A08493 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-09 - substituted by s6330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-09 - substituted by s6330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the administration of certain director of facility positions.
Title
Relates to the administration of certain director of facility positions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | Assembly | substituted by s6330 |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.824 |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported |
2014-01-17 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06330 (Same As) 2014-08-11 - SIGNED CHAP.299