NY A08493 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - signed chap.26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - signed chap.26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the manufacture of beer, spirits, cider, wine and mead at the community college in Broome county and Cornell university, acting on behalf of the New York state college of agriculture and life sciences and the New York state agricultural experiment station.
Title
Authorizes the manufacture of beer, spirits, cider, wine and mead at the community college in Broome county and Cornell university, acting on behalf of the New York state college of agriculture and life sciences and the New York state agricultural experiment station.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Assembly | signed chap.26 |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2024-01-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.55 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8069 |
2024-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-01-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-01-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-01-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.212 |
2024-01-08 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-04 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S08069 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8493