NY A08516 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-23 - substituted by s8092
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-23 - substituted by s8092
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain non-public schools to be exempt from being required to provide menstrual products in the restrooms of school buildings, upon a demonstration to the commissioner of education that the school does not serve students who need such products, and that such products are otherwise available to students who might need them.
Title
Allows certain non-public schools to be exempt from being required to provide menstrual products in the restrooms of school buildings, upon a demonstration to the commissioner of education that the school does not serve students who need such products, and that such products are otherwise available to students who might need them.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-23 | Assembly | substituted by s8092 |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.239 |
2024-01-17 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-04 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08092 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - SIGNED CHAP.22