NY A08529 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes references to private duty nursing services to specialized nursing services.
Title
Changes references to private duty nursing services to specialized nursing services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-04 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to health |
2011-07-13 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S03672 (Same As) 2012-03-06 - referred to health