NY A08541 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - substituted by s4242
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - substituted by s4242
Summary
To establish one deadline for the publication of the enrollment lists by the boards of elections.
Title
Relates to the deadline for the publication of enrollment lists; requires list to be published before the first day of April in all election years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | substituted by s4242 | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.607 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-06-22 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-22 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-22 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-15 | ordered to third reading rules cal.259 | |
2009-06-15 | rules report cal.259 | |
2009-06-15 | reported | |
2009-06-10 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-05-27 | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S4242 (Same As) 2010-03-30 - SIGNED CHAP.28
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08541&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |