NY A08542 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - print number 8542b
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - print number 8542b
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defines freight transportation broker as any sole proprietor, partnership, firm, corporation, limited liability company, association or other legal entity that brokers the transportation of goods for outside third-party employers.
Title
Defines freight transportation broker as any sole proprietor, partnership, firm, corporation, limited liability company, association or other legal entity that brokers the transportation of goods for outside third-party employers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Assembly | print number 8542b |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to labor |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | print number 8542a |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to labor |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S06813 (Same As) 2018-05-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE