NY A08548 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.178
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.178
Summary
Relates to extending the authorization for additional sales and compensating use tax in Dutchess county until 2011.
Title
Relates to extending the authorization for additional sales and compensating use tax in Dutchess county until 2011.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-11 | signed chap.178 | |
2009-07-10 | delivered to governor | |
2009-07-09 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-07-09 | REPASSED SENATE | |
2009-07-09 | HOME RULE REQUEST | |
2009-07-09 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-06-30 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-06-30 | HOME RULE REQUEST | |
2009-06-30 | 3RD READING CAL.594 | |
2009-06-30 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4039 | |
2009-06-22 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-22 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-22 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-22 | home rule request | |
2009-06-22 | ordered to third reading rules cal.611 | |
2009-06-22 | rules report cal.611 | |
2009-06-22 | reported | |
2009-06-22 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-06-17 | print number 8548b | |
2009-06-17 | amend and recommit to ways and means | |
2009-06-08 | print number 8548a | |
2009-06-08 | amend and recommit to ways and means | |
2009-05-27 | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04039 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.178
S50437 (Same As) 2009-06-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
S64437 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65068 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
S50437 (Same As) 2009-06-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
S64437 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65068 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08548&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |