NY A08559 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-14 - substituted by s6113a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-14 - substituted by s6113a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Legalizes the dissolution of the offices of fire commissioners by the town of Deposit.
Title
Legalizes the dissolution of the offices of fire commissioners by the town of Deposit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-14 | Assembly | substituted by s6113a |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.157 |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.157 |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-04-18 | Assembly | print number 8559a |
2012-04-18 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2011-08-31 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06113 (Same As) 2012-08-17 - APPROVAL MEMO.8