NY A08559 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - print number 8559a
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - print number 8559a
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits naming dependent children under the age of 18 living in the same household with a parent or guardian in petitions to recover possession of real property and eviction warrants; seals any records pertaining to dependent children under the age of 18 living in the same household with a parent or guardian who were residing on or removed from such property.
Title
Prohibits naming dependent children under the age of 18 living in the same household with a parent or guardian in petitions to recover possession of real property and eviction warrants; seals any records pertaining to dependent children under the age of 18 living in the same household with a parent or guardian who were residing on or removed from such property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Assembly | print number 8559a |
2022-03-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to judiciary |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07376 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES