NY A08579 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for electronic monitoring of defendants in judicial diversion programs.
Title
Provides for electronic monitoring of defendants in judicial diversion programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-10 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | print number 8579a |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to correction |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2015-11-16 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S07036 (Same As) 2016-06-06 - referred to correction