NY A08642 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-23 - substituted by s1145c
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-23 - substituted by s1145c
Summary
Requires a reduction in sulfur emissions by 2011 for all heating oil used in the state and allows the governor to suspend such reduction if there is not an adequate supply of the required fuel.
Title
Requires a reduction in sulfur emissions by 2011 for all heating oil used in the state and allows the governor to suspend such reduction if there is not an adequate supply of the required fuel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-23 | substituted by s1145c | |
2010-06-17 | amended on third reading 8642a | |
2010-06-17 | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading | |
2010-06-17 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-17 | recalled from senate | |
2010-02-09 | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION | |
2010-02-09 | delivered to senate | |
2010-02-09 | passed assembly | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.615 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-09-10 | RECOMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-09-10 | RESTORED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-07-16 | RECOMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-07-16 | 3RD READING CAL.899 | |
2009-07-16 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1145A | |
2009-06-18 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-17 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-17 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-15 | ordered to third reading rules cal.261 | |
2009-06-15 | rules report cal.261 | |
2009-06-15 | reported | |
2009-06-09 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-06-01 | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S01145 (Same As) 2009-07-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8642
A10108 (Same As) 2010-03-04 - referred to environmental conservation
A10108 (Same As) 2010-03-04 - referred to environmental conservation
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08642&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |