NY A08679 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-21 - signed chap.406
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-21 - signed chap.406
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the state policy with regard to the alcoholic beverage control law shall be to promote economic development and job opportunities in the beer, wine and liquor industries of the state.
Title
Provides that the state policy with regard to the alcoholic beverage control law shall be to promote economic development and job opportunities in the beer, wine and liquor industries of the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-21 | Senate | signed chap.406 |
2014-10-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.300 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2321A |
2014-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.620 |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | reported |
2014-02-03 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S02321 (Same As) 2014-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8679