NY A08683 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s6882a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s6882a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that policies and contracts covering diagnostic screening for prostate cancer shall not be subject to cost sharing; requires notice of availability of such coverage without cost sharing to be provided in the notice to persons at risk of or having prostate cancer.
Title
Provides that policies and contracts covering diagnostic screening for prostate cancer shall not be subject to cost sharing; requires notice of availability of such coverage without cost sharing to be provided in the notice to persons at risk of or having prostate cancer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s6882a |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.799 |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | print number 8683a |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2017-09-25 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S06882 (Same As) 2018-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.335