NY A08762 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of health to study the effectiveness and accuracy of devices used to estimate blood alcohol content by law enforcement agencies.
Title
Directs the commissioner of health to study the effectiveness and accuracy of devices used to estimate blood alcohol content by law enforcement agencies.
Sponsors
Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] | Asm. Aravella Simotas [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] |
Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Michael Montesano [R] | Sen. Jacob Ashby [R] | Asm. Philip Ramos [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.360 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.360 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08842 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - REFERRED TO RULES