NY A08961 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - signed chap.29
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - signed chap.29
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the Central Pine Barrens area and the core preservation area; amends the legal description of such areas.
Title
Relates to the Central Pine Barrens area and the core preservation area; amends the legal description of such areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-17 | Senate | signed chap.29 |
2020-04-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-02-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.207 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7315 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.365 |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07315 (Same As) 2020-04-17 - signed chap.29