NY A08980 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits special districts to adopt local laws providing for an exemption for improvements to residential real property for the purpose of facilitating accessibility of such property to a physically disabled owner.
Title
Permits special districts to adopt local laws providing for an exemption for improvements to residential real property for the purpose of facilitating accessibility of such property to a physically disabled owner.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07187 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - referred to ways and means