NY A08997 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - ordered to third reading cal.466
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - ordered to third reading cal.466
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to notice of indicated reports of child maltreatment and changes of placement in child protective and voluntary foster care placement and review proceedings.
Title
Relates to notice of indicated reports of child maltreatment and changes of placement in child protective and voluntary foster care placement and review proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.466 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | substituted for a8997 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | referred to children and families |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.30 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | substituted by s6951 |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.466 |
2020-03-03 | Assembly | reported |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S06951 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - ordered to third reading cal.466