NY A09007 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to making an appropriation to pay Jennifer Simanowitz, widow of the late Michael A. Simanowitz, member of the assembly from the twenty-seventh assembly district, the balance due of his unpaid annual compensation for a portion of the year 2017.
Title
Relates to making an appropriation to pay Jennifer Simanowitz, widow of the late Michael A. Simanowitz, member of the assembly from the twenty-seventh assembly district, the balance due of his unpaid annual compensation for a portion of the year 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Senate | tabled |
2018-03-02 | Senate | vetoed memo.2 |
2018-02-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-02-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.484 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7428 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.4 |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | rules report cal.4 |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-01-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07428 (Same As) 2018-02-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9007