NY A09028 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - signed chap.346
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - signed chap.346
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system, in the county of Ulster, as the "Private First Class Douglas Cordo Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system, in the county of Ulster, as the "Private First Class Douglas Cordo Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Senate | signed chap.346 |
2016-09-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.411 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6372A |
2016-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.800 |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-04-29 | Assembly | print number 9028b |
2016-04-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2016-04-26 | Assembly | print number 9028a |
2016-04-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2016-01-19 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06372 (Same As) 2016-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9028B