NY A09032 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the various fixed fees for the provision of certain services by the sheriff.
Title
Increases the various fixed fees for the provision of certain services by the sheriff.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-12 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05110 (Same As) 2018-05-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE