NY A09036 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-04 - substituted by s6233a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-04 - substituted by s6233a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the reestablishment of the existence of the Middletown community development agency.
Title
Authorizes the reestablishment of the existence of the Middletown community development agency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-04 | Assembly | substituted by s6233a |
2012-06-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.701 |
2012-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2012-05-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-04-25 | Assembly | print number 9036a |
2012-04-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2012-04-19 | Assembly | reference changed to local governments |
2012-01-17 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06233 (Same As) 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.200